Štefan Mikeš
- Position: unknown
- Player status: coach
- Gender: male
- Nationality: Slovakia
- Birth date: 28.03.1965 (59 years)
- Shoots: N/A
Season | Team | League | Pos | LPos | W | L | D | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2017-18 | Nové Zámky | Extraliga (SVK) | Head Coach | |||||
Left: 20.09.2017 | Reason of leaving: fired | ||||||||
Note: replaced by Ladislav Lubina | ||||||||
2016-17 | Nové Zámky | Extraliga (SVK) | Head Coach | 8. | 18 | 23 | 15 | |
Leavel reached: lost playoffs quarterfinals | Hired: 21.12.2016 | ||||||||
Note: replaced fired Julius Penzes | ||||||||
2016-17 | Havířov | 1.liga | Head Coach | |||||
Left: 20.10.2016 | Reason of leaving: bad results | ||||||||
2015-16 | Havířov | 1.liga | Head Coach | |||||
2014-15 | Kapfenberg Steelers | Inter-National League (INL) | Head Coach | 7. | 13 | 12 | 5 | |
Leavel reached: lost playoffs quarter finals | ||||||||
2013-14 | Kapfenberg Bulls | Inter-National League (INL) | Head Coach | |||||
2012-13 | KH Sanok | Polska Liga Hokejowa | Head Coach | 1. | 28 | 6 | 3 | |
Leavel reached: lost playoffs semifinals - lost bronze series | ||||||||
Note: Replaced Milan Stas november 2012 | ||||||||
2011-12 | Slovan Bratislava | Extraliga (SVK) | Head Coach | |||||
Note: Replaced by Jan Neliba mid-season | ||||||||
2010-11 | Slovakia U20 | Extraliga (SVK) | Head Coach | |||||
Note: Team Slovakia U20 compete off the standing | ||||||||
2010-11 | Slovakia | WJC (U20) | Head Coach | 8. | 2 | 4 | 0 | |
2009-10 | Slovakia | WJC (U20) | Head Coach | 8. | 2 | 4 | 0 | |
2009-10 | Slovakia U20 | Extraliga (SVK) | Head Coach | |||||
Note: Team Slovakia U20 compete off the standing | ||||||||
2008-09 | Slovakia U20 | Extraliga (SVK) | Head Coach | 13. | ||||
Note: Team Slovakia U20 compete off the standing | ||||||||
2007-08 | Slovakia U20 | Extraliga (SVK) | Head Coach | 12. | 2 | 28 | 3 | |
Leavel reached: out of playoffs | ||||||||
Note: Team Slovakia U20 compete off the standing | ||||||||
2006-07 | Dresdner Eislöwen | 2. Bundesliga | Head Coach | |||||
Note: Replaced Jiri Kochta mid-season | ||||||||
2004-05 | Grizzly Adams Wolfsburg | DEL | Head Coach | |||||
Note: Replaced by Bob Leslie mid-season | ||||||||
2003-04 | Grizzly Adams Wolfsburg | 2. Bundesliga | Head Coach | 1. | 30 | 11 | 7 | |
Leavel reached: champion - Promoted to DEL | ||||||||
2002-03 | Grizzly Adams Wolfsburg | 2. Bundesliga | Head Coach | 7. | 24 | 19 | 13 | |
Leavel reached: lost playoffs quarter finals | ||||||||
2001-02 | Grizzly Adams Wolfsburg | 2. Bundesliga | Head Coach | 6. | 23 | 17 | 12 | |
Leavel reached: lost playoffs quarter finals | ||||||||
2000-01 | Grizzly Adams Wolfsburg | Oberliga Nord | Head Coach | 1. | 34 | 4 | 2 | |
Leavel reached: champion - Promoted to Bundesliga | ||||||||
1999-00 | Grizzly Adams Wolfsburg | Oberliga Nord | Head Coach | 5. | 29 | 14 | 9 | |
Leavel reached: lost playoffs round 1 | ||||||||
1998-99 | Grizzly Adams Wolfsburg | 1.Liga Nord (D) | Head Coach | 9. | 9 | 23 | 4 | |
Leavel reached: out of playoffs |
No games found player Štefan Mikeš.
Did you find any incorrect or incomplete information? Please, let us know.
Czech Rep.: Tipsport extraliga | 1.liga | 2.liga
Slovakia: Tipsport Extraliga | 1.liga
Sweden: SHL | HockeyAllsvenskan
Other: EBEL | Belarus | Croatia | Denmark | Estonia | France | Great Britain | Iceland | Italy | Latvia | Lithuania | MOL-liga | Norway | Poland | Romania | Serbia | Slovenia | Spain | NHL | AHL |
Changes in Tre Kronor’s coaching staff for February tournaments
February 2025 will be a crucial month for Swedish hockey, with the national team participating in both the Beijer Hockey Games in Stockholm and the NHL 4 Nations Face-off. As part of the preparations, the Swedish Ice Hockey Association has announced ... Read more»