Sergei Zubov
- Position: defender
- Player status: coach
- Gender: male
- Nationality: Russia
- Birth date: 22.07.1970 (54 years)
- Birth place: Moskva, Russia, USSR
- Height: 185 cm / 6' 1"
- Weight: 91 kg / 201 lbs
- Shoots: right
- Draft 1: New York Rangers, year: 1990, position: 85
Show players drafted in 1990
- Trivia:
Named Best Defenceman EJC 1987-88
Named to EJC All-Star team 1987-88
Named to NHL All Star Game 1997-98, 1998-99, 1999-00
Named to NHL Second All-Star team 2005-06
Top D-man scorer and assistant (KHL, regular season) 2009-10
Season | Team | League | Pos | LPos | W | L | D | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2023-24 | SKA St. Petersburg | KHL | Assistant Coach | |||||
2022-23 | SKA St. Petersburg | KHL | Assistant Coach | |||||
2021-22 | Russia | WJC Cancelled (U20) | Head Coach | |||||
2021-22 | Russia | Euro Hockey Tour | Assistant Coach | |||||
2021-22 | Dinamo Riga | KHL | Head Coach | |||||
Left: 21.10.2021 | ||||||||
2019-20 | Dallas Stars | NHL | Team Staff | |||||
Hired: 27.12.2019 | ||||||||
2019-20 | HC Sochi | KHL | Head Coach | |||||
Left: 12.10.2019 | Reason of leaving: fired | ||||||||
2018-19 | HC Sochi | KHL | Head Coach | |||||
2017-18 | HC Sochi | KHL | Head Coach | |||||
Hired: 03.03.2017 | ||||||||
2015-16 | SKA St. Petersburg | KHL | Assistant Coach | |||||
Left: 16.10.2015 | ||||||||
2015-16 | SKA St. Petersburg | KHL | Head Coach | 10. | 27 | 20 | 13 | |
Leavel reached: Lost conference final | Hired: 16.10.2015 | ||||||||
Note: began as assistant, replaced fired Andrei Nazarov on 16.10.2015 | ||||||||
2014-15 | SKA St. Petersburg | KHL | Assistant Coach | |||||
Leavel reached: Champion | ||||||||
2013-14 | CSKA Moskva | Spengler Cup | Assistant Coach | |||||
2013-14 | CSKA Moskva | KHL | Assistant Coach | |||||
2012-13 | St. Louis Blues | NHL | Team Staff | |||||
2012-13 | CSKA Moskva | KHL | Assistant Coach | |||||
2011-12 | SKA St. Petersburg | KHL | Assistant Coach |
Season | Team | League | # | GP | G | A | P | PIM | +/- |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1995-96 | Russia | World Cup of Hockey | 4 | 1 | 1 | 2 | 0 | ||
1991-92 | Russia | National team games | 2 | 0 | 1 | 1 | 0 | ||
1991-92 | Russia | World Championship | 6 | 2 | 2 | 4 | 10 | ||
1991-92 | Russia | Olympics | 8 | 0 | 1 | 1 | 0 | ||
1989-90 | Soviet Union | National team games | 3 | 0 | 2 | 2 | 0 | ||
1989-90 | Soviet Union | WJC (U20) | 7 | 1 | 3 | 4 | 14 | ||
1988-89 | Soviet Union | National team games | 4 | 0 | |||||
1988-89 | Soviet Union | WJC (U20) | 7 | 0 | 5 | 5 | 4 | ||
1987-88 | Soviet Union | U18 National team games (U18) | |||||||
1987-88 | Soviet Union | EJC (U18) | 6 | 0 | 2 | 2 | 2 |
Season | Team | League | # | GP | G | A | P | PIM | +/- |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2009-10 | SKA St. Petersburg | KHL (Play-off) | 4 | 0 | 2 | 2 | 0 | 0 | |
2009-10 | SKA St. Petersburg | KHL | 53 | 10 | 32 | 42 | 32 | 8 | |
2008-09 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 10 | 0 | 4 | 4 | 0 | -4 | |
2007-08 | Dallas Stars | NHL (Play-off) | 11 | 1 | 5 | 6 | 4 | -4 | |
2007-08 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 46 | 4 | 31 | 35 | 12 | 6 | |
2006-07 | Dallas Stars | NHL (Play-off) | 6 | 0 | 4 | 4 | 2 | 3 | |
2006-07 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 78 | 12 | 42 | 54 | 26 | 0 | |
2005-06 | Dallas Stars | NHL (Play-off) | 5 | 1 | 5 | 6 | 6 | -1 | |
2005-06 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 78 | 13 | 58 | 71 | 46 | 20 | |
2004-05 | Did not play | none | |||||||
2003-04 | Dallas Stars | NHL (Play-off) | 5 | 1 | 1 | 2 | 0 | -5 | |
2003-04 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 77 | 7 | 35 | 42 | 20 | 0 | |
2002-03 | Dallas Stars | NHL (Play-off) | 12 | 4 | 10 | 14 | 4 | 2 | |
2002-03 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 82 | 11 | 44 | 55 | 26 | 21 | |
2001-02 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 80 | 12 | 32 | 44 | 22 | -4 | |
2000-01 | Dallas Stars | NHL (Play-off) | 10 | 1 | 5 | 6 | 4 | 2 | |
2000-01 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 79 | 10 | 41 | 51 | 24 | 22 | |
1999-00 | Dallas Stars | NHL (Play-off) | 18 | 2 | 7 | 9 | 6 | 1 | |
1999-00 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 77 | 9 | 33 | 42 | 18 | -2 | |
1998-99 | Dallas Stars | NHL (Play-off) | 23 | 1 | 12 | 13 | 4 | 13 | |
1998-99 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 81 | 10 | 41 | 51 | 20 | 9 | |
1997-98 | Dallas Stars | NHL (Play-off) | 17 | 4 | 5 | 9 | 2 | 3 | |
1997-98 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 73 | 10 | 47 | 57 | 16 | 16 | |
1996-97 | Dallas Stars | NHL (Play-off) | 7 | 0 | 3 | 3 | 2 | 4 | |
1996-97 | Dallas Stars | NHL | 78 | 13 | 30 | 43 | 24 | 19 | |
1995-96 | Pittsburgh Penguins | NHL (Play-off) | 18 | 1 | 14 | 15 | 26 | 9 | |
1995-96 | Pittsburgh Penguins | NHL | 64 | 11 | 55 | 66 | 22 | 28 | |
1994-95 | New York Rangers | NHL (Play-off) | 10 | 3 | 8 | 11 | 2 | -9 | |
1994-95 | New York Rangers | NHL | 38 | 10 | 26 | 36 | 18 | -2 | |
1993-94 | Binghamton Rangers | AHL | 2 | 1 | 2 | 3 | 0 | ||
1993-94 | New York Rangers | NHL (Play-off) | 22 | 5 | 14 | 19 | 0 | 10 | |
1993-94 | New York Rangers | NHL | 78 | 12 | 77 | 89 | 39 | 20 | |
1992-93 | Binghamton Rangers | AHL (Play-off) | 11 | 5 | 5 | 10 | 2 | ||
1992-93 | Binghamton Rangers | AHL | 30 | 7 | 29 | 36 | 14 | ||
1992-93 | New York Rangers | NHL | 49 | 8 | 23 | 31 | 4 | -1 | |
1992-93 | CSKA Moskva | International Hockey League | 1 | 0 | 1 | 1 | 0 | ||
1991-92 | CSKA Moskva | Spengler Cup | 5 | 2 | 1 | 3 | |||
1991-92 | CSKA Moskva | Soviet League (Play-off) | 8 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 2 | ||
1991-92 | CSKA Moskva | Soviet League | 36 | 4 | 7 | 11 | 6 | ||
1990-91 | CSKA Moskva | Soviet League | 41 | 6 | 5 | 11 | 12 | ||
1989-90 | CSKA Moskva | Soviet League | 48 | 6 | 2 | 8 | 16 | ||
1988-89 | CSKA Moskva | Soviet League | 29 | 1 | 4 | 5 | 10 |
No games found player Sergei Zubov.
Did you find any incorrect or incomplete information? Please, let us know.
-
22 Oct 2021
-
25 Apr 2021
-
03 Apr 2017
Note: coached SKA St. Petersburg in 2015-2016 -
06 Jul 2011
Czech Rep.: Tipsport extraliga | 1.liga | 2.liga
Slovakia: Tipsport Extraliga | 1.liga
Sweden: SHL | HockeyAllsvenskan
Other: EBEL | Belarus | Croatia | Denmark | Estonia | France | Great Britain | Iceland | Italy | Latvia | Lithuania | MOL-liga | Norway | Poland | Romania | Serbia | Slovenia | Spain | NHL | AHL |
Changes in Tre Kronor’s coaching staff for February tournaments
February 2025 will be a crucial month for Swedish hockey, with the national team participating in both the Beijer Hockey Games in Stockholm and the NHL 4 Nations Face-off. As part of the preparations, the Swedish Ice Hockey Association has announced ... Read more»