Jason Morgan
- Position: center
- Player status: coach
- Gender: male
- Nationality: Canada
- Birth date: 09.10.1976 (47 years)
- Birth place: St John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
- Height: 186 cm / 6' 1"
- Weight: 97 kg / 214 lbs
- Shoots: left
- Draft 1: Los Angeles, year: 1995, round: 5, position: 118
Show players drafted in 1995
- Trivia:
2013-2014 CHL Best Player on Face-Offs and Best Leader
Season | Team | League | Pos | LPos | W | L | D | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2024-25 | Ujpesti TE | Erste Liga | Head Coach | |||||
Hired: 06.05.2024 | ||||||||
2023-24 | Glasgow | Challenge Cup (EIHL) (Play-off) | Head Coach | |||||
2023-24 | Glasgow | Challenge Cup (EIHL) | Head Coach | |||||
2023-24 | Glasgow | EIHL | Head Coach | |||||
Hired: 31.05.2023 | ||||||||
2022-23 | Heilbronner Falken | DEL2 | Head Coach | 12 | 20 | 0 | ||
Left: 29.12.2022 | ||||||||
2021-22 | Heilbronner Falken | DEL2 (Play-off) | Head Coach | |||||
2021-22 | Heilbronner Falken | DEL2 | Head Coach | 6. | 27 | 25 | 0 | |
2020-21 | HSC Miercurea Ciuc | Campionatul National De Hochei | Head Coach | |||||
2020-21 | HSC Miercurea Ciuc | Erste Liga | Head Coach | |||||
2019-20 | HSC Miercurea Ciuc | Cupa Romaniei | Head Coach | |||||
Leavel reached: champion | ||||||||
2019-20 | HSC Miercurea Ciuc | Erste Liga | Head Coach | |||||
Hired: 08.05.2019 | ||||||||
2018-19 | Aalborg Pirates | Danish Cup | Head Coach | |||||
2018-19 | Aalborg Pirates | Champions Hockey League | Head Coach | |||||
2018-19 | Aalborg Pirates | Metal Ligaen | Head Coach | |||||
Left: February.. | Reason of leaving: fired | ||||||||
2017-18 | Dunaújvárosi Acélbikák | Erste Liga | Head Coach | 3. | 20 | 11 | 1 | |
Leavel reached: lost quarterfinals | Hired: 17.10.2018 | ||||||||
Note: replaced David Musial, staying as assistant | ||||||||
2016-17 | Debreceni HK | MOL Liga | Head Coach | 4. | 20 | 14 | 6 | |
Leavel reached: lost semifinal | Hired: 05.11.2016 | ||||||||
Note: replacing fired Evgeny Mukhin | ||||||||
2016-17 | Opole | Polska Hokej Liga | Head Coach | |||||
Hired: 31.05.2016 | Left: 03.11.2016 | Reason of leaving: fired | ||||||||
2015-16 | Jegesmedvék | MOL Liga | Head Coach | 1. | 33 | 5 | 10 | |
Leavel reached: champion | Hired: 02.01.2015 | ||||||||
Note: replaced fired Peter Mayer | ||||||||
2015-16 | Jegesmedvék | EBJL (U18) | Head Coach |
No games found player Jason Morgan.
Did you find any incorrect or incomplete information? Please, let us know.
-
07 May 2024
-
29 Dec 2022
-
18 May 2021
-
10 May 2019
Note: fired by Aalborg in February
Czech Rep.: Tipsport extraliga | 1.liga | 2.liga
Slovakia: Tipsport Extraliga | 1.liga
Sweden: SHL | HockeyAllsvenskan
Other: EBEL | Belarus | Croatia | Denmark | Estonia | France | Great Britain | Iceland | Italy | Latvia | Lithuania | MOL-liga | Norway | Poland | Romania | Serbia | Slovenia | Spain | NHL | AHL |
Changes in Tre Kronor’s coaching staff for February tournaments
February 2025 will be a crucial month for Swedish hockey, with the national team participating in both the Beijer Hockey Games in Stockholm and the NHL 4 Nations Face-off. As part of the preparations, the Swedish Ice Hockey Association has announced ... Read more»